# Shortcut to multiply any 2 digit number by 125

I can multiply any 2 digit number by 125 in seconds. So can you! Use this amazing shortcut trick to get the answer you needed in seconds.

Let us go through the steps below

## Multiply any 2 digit number by 125 shortcut

Step 1:Divide the given number by 8.
Step 2:Now multiply the result obtained in step 1 by 1000 to get your answer.

Let us now consider a few examples to understand better

Example 1: 24 x 125 = ?
Step 1:Dividing 24 by 8
we get 24/8=3

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 3 x 1000 = 3000

Ans  24 x 125 = 3000

Example 2: 64 x 125 = ?
Step 1:Dividing 64 by 8
we get 64/8=8

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 8 x 1000 = 8000

Ans    64 x 125 = 8000

Example 3: 32 x 125 = ?

Step 1:Dividing 32 by 8
we get 32/8=4

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 4 x 1000 = 4000

Ans    32 x 125 = 4000

Example 4=: 57 x 125 = ?

Step 1:Dividing 57 by 8
we get 57/8=7.125

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 7.125 x 1000 = 7125

Ans    57 x 125 = 7125

Example 5=: 28 x 125 = ?

Step 1:Dividing 28 by 8
we get 28/8=3.5

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 3.5 x 1000 = 3500

Ans    28 x 125 = 3500

Example 6=: 48 x 125 = ?

Step 1:Dividing 48 by 8
we get 48/8=6

Step 2:Multiplying result obtained in step 1
we get 6 x 1000 = 6000

Ans    48 x 125 = 6000

Tip: For a number exactly divisible by 8, you can calculate mentally much faster.