Today we shall see a new trick to multiply any number from 10-19 by 6 in seconds

Let us see the steps

**Ans 14 x 6 = 84**

Video

Bank Exams, Math Tricks & Bank Careers

Today we shall see a new trick to multiply any number from 10-19 by 6 in seconds

Let us see the steps

Step 1:Assume 10 as base

Step 2:Multiply the base by 6

Step 3:Multiply the unit place digit by 6

Step 4:Add the results obtained in step 2 and step 3 to get your answer

Now, Let us consider an example to understand better

Example 1:14 x 6=?

Step 1: Assuming base as 10

Step 2:Multiplying the base by 10

We get, 10 x 6= 60

Step 3:Multiplying the unit place digit by 6

We get, 4 x 6=24

Step 4:Adding results of step 2 and step 3

We get, 60 + 24 = 84

**Ans 14 x 6 = 84**

Video

Today you will be learning another amazing shortcut to multiply 2 numbers whose difference is 2.This trick is especially effective to use when the number in between the 2 numbers to be multiplied is 5.You will see why.

Let us go through the steps

**Step 1:**Identify the number in between the 2 numbers.

**Step 2:**Find the square of the number identified in step 1.

**Step 3:**Subtract 1 from the result obtained in step 2.

Let us now consider few examples to understand better

**Example 1:**12 x 14=?

Notice that there is difference of 2 between the numbers 12 and 14.

We shall now apply the trick that we learnt

**Step 1:**We find that 13 lies in between 12 and 14.

**Step 2:**Squaring 13 we get

13²=169

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 169 -1=168

**Ans 12 x 14=168**

**Example 2: **24 x 26=?

**Step 1: **We find that 25 lies in between 24 and 26.

**Step 2: **Squaring 25 we get

25²=625

(Use the shortcut trick to square any number ending in 5)

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 625 -1=624

**Ans 24 x 26=624**

**Example 3: **27 x 29=?

**Step 1: **We find that 28 lies in between 27 and 29.

**Step 2: **Squaring 28 we get

28²=784

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 784 -1=783

**Ans 27 x 29=783**

**Example 4: **17 x 19=?

**Step 1: **We find that 18 lies in between 17 and 19.

**Step 2: **Squaring 18 we get

18²=324

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 324 -1=323

**Ans 17 x 19=323**

**Example 5: **16 x 18=?

**Step 1: **We find that 17 lies in between 16 and 18.

**Step 2: **Squaring 18 we get

17²=289

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 289-1=288

**Ans 16 x 18=288**

**Tip: This trick is most effective to use when you know square of the number in between the 2 numbers.**

In my previous post, we learnt how the multiply any 2 digit number by 111.Today we shall see the shortcut way to multiply any 3 digit number by 111.

Lets go through the steps below

**Step 1:**Write down the unit place digit of the 3 digit number.

**Step 2:**Add unit place digit and tenth place digit and write down the number to the left of the unit place digit number.

**Step 3:**Add unit place digit, tenth place digit and hundreth place digit and write down the number.

**Step 4:**Add tenth place digit and hundredth place digit and write down the number.

**Step 5:**Write down the hundredth place digit.

Now, we shall consider some examples to understand better.

**Example 1:123 x 111=?**

**Step 1:**Unit place digit is 3 which we write it down as it is.

_ _ _ _ __3__

**Step 2:**Adding unit place digit and tenth place digit

** ** We get 3 + 2=5

_ _ _ __5__3

** **

**Step 3:**Adding all the three digits

We get 3 + 2 + 1=6

_ _ __6__ __5__3

**Step 4:**Adding tenth and hundredth place digit

We get 2 + 1=3

_ __3__ __6__ __5__3

**Step 5:**Hundredth place digit is 1 which we shall write it down.

** **We get 13653

**Ans 123 x 111=13653**

**Example 2:234 x 111=?**

**Step 1:**Unit place digit is 4 which we write it down as it is.

_ _ _ _ __4__

**Step 2:**Adding unit place digit and tenth place digit

** ** We get 4 + 3=7

_ _ _ __7__3

** **

**Step 3:**Adding all the three digits

We get 4 + 3 + 2=9

_ _ __9__ __7__3

**Step 4:**Adding tenth and hundredth place digit

We get 3 + 2=5

_ __5__ __9__ __7__3

**Step 5:**Hundredth place digit is 2 which we shall write it down.

** **We get 25974

**Ans: 234 x 111=25974**

In the previous post we learnt how to multiply any number from 80 to 89 by 5 in seconds.Today we are going to learn another cool trick to multiply any number from 90 to 99 by 5 in seconds.

Let us see the steps

**Step 1:** Assume the base as 90**Step 2:** Multiply the base by 5**Step 3:**Multiply the unit place digit by 5**Step 4:**Add the results obtained in step 2 and step 3 to get

final answer.

Now lets consider a few examples to understand better

**Example 1:93 x 5 = ?****Step 1:**We assume the base as 90.**Step 2:**Multiplying the base by 5

We get 90 x 5 = 450**Step 3:**Multiplying the unit place digit by 5

We get 3 x 5 =15**Step 4:**Adding results obtained in step 2 and step 3

We get 450 + 15 = 465**Ans 93 x 5 =465****Example 2:98 x 5 = ?****Step 1:**We assume the base as 90.**Step 2:**Multiplying the base by 5

We get 90 x 5 = 450**Step 3:**Multiplying the unit place digit by 5

We get 8 x 5 = 40**Step 4:**Adding results obtained in step 2 and step 3

We get 450 + 40 = 490**Ans 98 x 5 =490**

In the previous post we learnt how to multiply any number from 70 to 79 by 5 in seconds.Today we are going to learn another cool trick to multiply any number from 80 to 89 by 5 in seconds.

Let us see the steps

**Step 1:** Assume the base as 80

**Step 2:** Multiply the base by 5

**Step 3:**Multiply the unit place digit by 5

**Step 4:**Add the results obtained in step 2 and step 3 to get

final answer.

Now lets consider a few examples to understand better

**Example 1:82 x 5 = ?**

**Step 1:**We assume the base as 80.

**Step 2:**Multiplying the base by 5

We get 80 x 5 = 400

**Step 3:**Multiplying the unit place digit by 5

We get 2 x 5 =10

**Step 4:**Adding results obtained in step 2 and step 3

We get 400 + 10 = 410

**Ans 82 x 5 =410**

**Example 2:87 x 5 = ?**

**Step 1:**We assume the base as 80.

**Step 2:**Multiplying the base by 5

We get 80 x 5 = 400

**Step 3:**Multiplying the unit place digit by 5

We get 7 x 5 = 35

**Step 4:**Adding results obtained in step 2 and step 3

We get 400 + 35 = 435

**Ans 87 x 5 =435**