Today you will be learning another amazing shortcut to multiply 2 numbers whose difference is 2.This trick is especially effective to use when the number in between the 2 numbers to be multiplied is 5.You will see why.

## Shortcut to multiply any 2 numbers whose difference is 2

Let us go through the steps

**Step 1:**Identify the number in between the 2 numbers.

**Step 2:**Find the square of the number identified in step 1.

**Step 3:**Subtract 1 from the result obtained in step 2.

Let us now consider few examples to understand better

**Example 1:**12 x 14=?

Notice that there is difference of 2 between the numbers 12 and 14.

We shall now apply the trick that we learnt

**Step 1:**We find that 13 lies in between 12 and 14.

**Step 2:**Squaring 13 we get

13²=169

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 169 -1=168

**Ans 12 x 14=168**

**Example 2: **24 x 26=?

**Step 1: **We find that 25 lies in between 24 and 26.

**Step 2: **Squaring 25 we get

25²=625

(Use the shortcut trick to square any number ending in 5)

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 625 -1=624

**Ans 24 x 26=624**

**Example 3: **27 x 29=?

**Step 1: **We find that 28 lies in between 27 and 29.

**Step 2: **Squaring 28 we get

28²=784

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 784 -1=783

**Ans 27 x 29=783**

**Example 4: **17 x 19=?

**Step 1: **We find that 18 lies in between 17 and 19.

**Step 2: **Squaring 18 we get

18²=324

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 324 -1=323

**Ans 17 x 19=323**

**Example 5: **16 x 18=?

**Step 1: **We find that 17 lies in between 16 and 18.

**Step 2: **Squaring 18 we get

17²=289

**Step 3:**Subtracting 1 from the result obtained in step 2

We get 289-1=288

**Ans 16 x 18=288**

**Tip: This trick is most effective to use when you know square of the number in between the 2 numbers.**