A person who knows math tricks certainly has an edge over the others.With the ability to rapid do mental calculation one will not only be able to score higher marks in competitive exams but will also enhance his mental sharpness enormously. Its fun to calculate this way after all, steps of calculation need not be shown on paper!

Below we shall discuss one such multiplication trick wherein you will be able to multiply any two 3 digit numbers easily within seconds.

One thing to remember here is that both the numbers should be close to 100.The closer they are the easier it is to multiply.

Here are steps to do the 3 digit multiplication in detail

**Step 1:**Find the difference of each of the numbers from 100

**Step 2:**Multiply the differences that you found in step 1 to get the unit’s place digit

**Step 3:**Add the differences of both the numbers to 100 and place them to the left of the result obtained in step 2.

Let us now consider an example to understand better

Example 1: 102 x 103

Here we notice that both the numbers are close to 100

We shall apply the technique that we learnt

**Step 1:**First we find the differences of the numbers

We observe that

102 is 2 more than 100 so the difference is **2**

103 is 3 more than 100 so the difference is **3**

**Step 2:**Multiplying the differences

we get,

2 x 3=**6** which is the unit’s place digit.

**Step 3:**Now to find the rest of the number adding the differences to 100

we get,

2+3+100=**105**

Placing 105 to the left of the result obtained in step 2(6)

we get

**102 x 103=10506**

**Ans 10506**

**
**Try multiplying the below numbers using the above trick and see how fast you are able to do it

(1)101 x 102

(2)102 x 104

(3)103 x 104

(4)104 x 105

(5)105 x 106

(6)106 x 107

(7)107 x 108

(8)108 x 109

Please solve the example of 3 digit multiplication-

1.) 789*576

2.) 738*789

You are simply awesome man!! love to learn from your site. very easy and crystal clear steps!!!