# 2 digit multiplication trick whose tens digit is same

You must be wondering we have learnt so many multiplication tricks for 2 digit numbers,so how is this going to be helpful.Well, Knowing new tricks and where the trick can be applied to get the answer quickly can make all the difference. 2 digit multiplication trick whose tens digit is same is one of those tricks that you will learn today.

Condition to apply this trick is
When the ten’s place digit is same and the unit’s place digits add up to 10 then you can apply a shortcut trick to easily multiply any 2 digit numbers.

## 2 digit multiplication trick whose tens digit is same

Now,let us see the steps in detail

Step 1:To get the unit’s place digit multiply the unit’s place digit of the both the numbers.

Step 2:To get the ten’s place digit multiply the ten’s place digit with its consecutive(next) number.

Step 3:Place the result obtained in step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1.

Let us now practice some examples

Example 1: 26 x 24=?
We observe that ten’s place digit of both numbers=2
and by adding unit’s place digit of both numbers(6+4=10)we get 10.

Hence, we can apply this trick

Step 1:Multiplying the unit’s place digits we get
Unit’s place digit=6 x 4=24

Step 2:Multiplying ten’s place digit by its consecutive number we get
Ten’s place digit=2 x 3=6

Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get
624

Ans  26 x 24=624

Example 2: 43 x 47=?
We observe that ten’s place digit of both numbers=4
and by adding unit’s place digit of both numbers(3+7=10)we get 10

Step 1:Multiplying the unit’s place digits we get
Unit’s place digit=3 x 7=21

Step 2: Multiplying ten’s place digit by its consecutive number we get
Ten’s place digit=4 x 5=20

Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get
2021

Ans  43 x 47=2021

Example 3: 38 x 32=?
We observe that ten’s place digit of both numbers=3
and by adding unit’s place digit of both numbers(8+2=10)we get 10

Step 1:Multiplying the unit’s place digits we get
Unit’s place digit=8 x 2=16

Step 2: Multiplying ten’s place digit by its consecutive number we get
Ten’s place digit=3 x 4=12

Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get
1216

Ans  38 x 32=1216

Example 4: 65 x 65=?
We observe that ten’s place digit of both numbers=6
and by adding unit’s place digit of both numbers(5+5=10)we get 10

Step 1:Multiplying the unit’s place digits we get
Unit’s place digit=5 x 5=25

Step 2: Multiplying ten’s place digit by its consecutive number we get
Ten’s place digit=6 x 7=42

Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get
4225

Ans  65 x 65=4225

Example 5: 71 x 79=?
We observe that ten’s place digit of both numbers=7
and by adding unit’s place digit of both numbers(1+9=10)we get 10

Step 1:Multiplying the unit’s place digits we get
Unit’s place digit=1 x 9=09

Step 2: Multiplying ten’s place digit by its consecutive number we get
Ten’s place digit=7 x 8=56

Step 3:Placing the result of step 2 to the left of the result obtained in step 1 we get
5609

Ans  71 x 79=5609