Multiplying any 2 digit number by 11 is the easiest when you know this trick. Shortcut to multiply 2 digit by 11 is very easy to mentally get the correct answer. It saves a lot of time when this is part of a bigger problem given in bank exams.

## Shortcut to multiply 2 digit by 11

Let us now quickly go through the steps

Step 1: Enter the unit’s place digit as it is. This is the last digit of your answer.

Step 2: Enter the ten’s place digit leaving a blank in between for the middle digit.

Step 3: To find the middle digit, add unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit and input the digit in the blank.

NOTE: On adding if you arrive at a 2 digit number then, input only the unit’s place of the middle digit in the blank and add the ten’s place digit of the middle digit to the original ten’s place digit of the number.

Let me explain with an example to make it easy to understand

Example 1: 42 X 11

Step 1: Here the unit’s place digit is 2, enter as it is i.e 2

Step 2: Here the ten’s place digit is 4, so input it as follows leaving a blank between the unit’s place digit and the ten’s place digit for the middle digit.

4_2

Step 3: Now, By adding unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit (4+2=6)we get the middle digit as 6 which we enter in the blank as follows.

462

**Ans : 42 x 11=462**

Example 2: 31 X 11

Step 1: Here the unit’s place digit is 1, enter as it is i.e 1

Step 2: Here the ten’s place digit is 3, so input it as follows leaving a blank between the unit’s place digit and the ten’s place digit for the middle digit.

3_1

Step 3: Now, By adding unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit (3+1=4)we get the middle digit as 4 which we enter in the blank as follows.

341

**Ans : 31 x 11=341**

Example 3: 53 X 11

Step 1: Here the unit’s place digit is 3, enter as it is i.e 3

Step 2: Here the ten’s place digit is 5, input it as follows leaving a blank between the unit’s place digit and the ten’s place digit for the middle digit.

5_3

Step 3: Now, By adding unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit (3+5=8)we get the middle digit as 8 which we enter in the blank as follows.

583

**Ans : 53 x 11=583**

Example 4: 67 X 11

Step 1: Here the unit’s place digit is 7, enter as it is i.e 7

Step 2: Here the ten’s place digit is 6, so input it as follows leaving a blank between the unit’s place digit and the ten’s place digit for the middle digit.

6_7

Step 3: Now, By adding unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit (7+6=13)we get

2 digit number then, input only the unit’s place of the middle digit(3) in the blank and carry forward the ten’s place digit to step 4.

637

Step 4: Add the ten’s place digit(1) to the original ten’s place digit(6) of the number as follows.

6+1=7

**Ans : 67 x 11=737**

Example 5: 49 X 11

Step 1: Here the unit’s place digit is 9, enter as it is i.e 9

Step 2: Here the ten’s place digit is 4, so input it as follows leaving a blank between the unit’s place digit and the ten’s place digit for the middle digit.

4_9

Step 3: Now, By adding unit’s place digit and ten’s place digit (9+4=13)we get

2 digit number then, input only the unit’s place of the middle digit(3) in the blank and carry forward the ten’s place digit to step 4.

439

Step 4: Add the ten’s place digit(1) to the original ten’s place digit(4) of the number as follows.

4+1=5

**Ans : 49 x 11=539**

Tip to remember: Ten’s place (ten’s place + unit place) Unit’s place